EP1230149 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SULFUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MECS, Inc. Corporate Pointe 14522 South Outer Forty Road St. Louis, MO 63017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states MECS, Inc. Corporate Pointe 14522 South Outer Forty Road St. Louis, MO 63017 / US | ||
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard 40E St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURMASTER, Brian, M. 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, MO 63167 / US | 02 /
GOAR, B., Gene 1522 Hubbard Dr. Tyler TX 75703 / US | [2002/44] |
Former [2002/33] | 01 /
BURMASTER, Brian, M. 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, MO 63167 / US | ||
02 /
GOAR, B., Gene 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, MO 63167 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00970999.9 | 20.10.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000US29022 | Priority number, date | US19990160974P | 22.10.1999 Original published format: US 160974 P | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0130692 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1230149 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1230149 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1230149 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/04 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
C01B17/0413 (EP);
C01B17/04 (KR);
B01D53/1456 (EP);
B01D53/8615 (EP);
C01B17/0404 (EP);
C01B17/0456 (EP);
Y02C20/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON SCHWEFEL | [2006/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SULFUR | [2002/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DU SOUFRE | [2002/33] |
Former [2002/33] | VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINUNG VON SCHWEFEL | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05026241.9 / EP1642864 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2006
21.09.2006
ADMISSIBLE Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 16 2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Iyer-Baldew, Angelique Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 NL-2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2006
21.09.2006
ADMISSIBLE Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Iyer-Baldew, Angelique Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 NL-2501 CJ The Hague / NL | 19.10.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.04.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.11.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/16] | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.12.2005 | BE | 14.12.2005 | CH | 14.12.2005 | CY | 14.12.2005 | FI | 14.12.2005 | IT | 14.12.2005 | LI | 14.12.2005 | NL | 14.12.2005 | DK | 14.03.2006 | GR | 14.03.2006 | SE | 14.03.2006 | PT | 15.05.2006 | IE | 20.10.2006 | LU | 20.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | ES | 21.10.2010 | [2020/33] |
Former [2009/02] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CY | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
IE | 20.10.2006 | ||
LU | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
IE | 20.10.2006 | ||
LU | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
IE | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 14.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2067311 (HANS BAEHR) [A] 33-42 * figure .; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US3896215 (BRATZLER KARL, et al) [A] 1-32 * column 4, line 6 - line 14; example .; claims 1,2,10 *; | [A]US4795620 (HEISEL MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-32 * column 7, line 31 - line 33; figure 1; examples 1-3; claims 1-11 *; | [A]US4889700 (ELGUE JEAN [FR], et al) [A] 12,13 * example .; claim 1 *; | [A]US5035810 (HEISEL MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-32 * column 5, line 8 - line 12; figure 1; example . *; | [A]WO9220431 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 33-42 * figure 6A; claim 31 *; | [A]EP0581026 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [A] 1-32 * figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [DA]US5628977 (HEISEL MICHAEL [DE], et al) [DA] 1-32 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5820837 (MARJANOVICH BARRY S [CA], et al) [A] 33-42* claims 1-7 * |