EP1412008 - VENTILATION SYSTEM DURING GUIDED INSERTION OF AN ENDOTRACHEAL TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evergreen Medical, Inc. 9086 East Colorado Cirle Denver, CO 80231 / US | [2004/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTOPHER, Kent, L. 9086 East Colorado Circle Denver, CO 80231 / US | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00971049.2 | 25.08.2000 | [2004/18] | WO2000US40741 | Priority number, date | US19990411610 | 01.10.1999 Original published format: US 411610 | US20000525270 | 14.03.2000 Original published format: US 525270 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0124859 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412008 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
A61M16/06 (EP,US);
A61M16/0084 (EP,US);
A61M16/0409 (EP,US);
A61M16/0488 (EP,US);
A61M16/0493 (EP,US);
A61M16/0495 (EP,US);
A61M16/08 (EP,US);
A61M16/107 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0222 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/18] | Title | German: | VENTILATIONSANONDNUNG WAHREND DES GEFUHRTEN EINFUHRENS EINES ENDOTRACHEALTUBUS | [2004/18] | English: | VENTILATION SYSTEM DURING GUIDED INSERTION OF AN ENDOTRACHEAL TUBE | [2004/18] | French: | SYSTEME DE VENTILATION DURANT L'INTRODUCTION GUIDEE D'UN TUBE ENDOTRACHEAL | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 22.08.2002 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 31.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | 22.08.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.08.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [Y]US1873160 (STURTEVANT HAROLD V); | [Y]US3683908 (MICHAEL TANTRIMUDALIGE ANTHONY, et al); | [A]US4256099 (DRYDEN GALE E); | [Y]US4497318 (DONMICHAEL T A [US]); | [Y]US4848331 (NORTHWAY-MEYER ROBERT [US]); | [A]US5339808 (DON MICHAEL T ANTHONY [US]); | [A]US5694929 (CHRISTOPHER KENT L [US]); | [AP]US5964217 (CHRISTOPHER KENT L [US]) |