EP1233531 - INFORMATION COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, NONCONTACT IC CARD, AND IC CHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOYA, Mitsuyoshi Room 213 Seisyunnryo, 2-8 Saiwai-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1143 / JP | 02 /
TOKUMITSU, Shinichi Room309 RaundokootoKyotod. 23-2, Daigonakayama-m. Hushimi-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-1373 / JP | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00971742.2 | 02.11.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000JP07721 | Priority number, date | JP19990313422 | 04.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31342299 | [2002/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0133725 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233531 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/59, G06K7/00, H04B7/212, G06K19/07 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G06K7/10059 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/34] | H04B1/59 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/34] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KONTAKTLOSE IC-KARTE UND IC-CHIP | [2002/34] | English: | INFORMATION COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, NONCONTACT IC CARD, AND IC CHIP | [2002/34] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION D'INFORMATION, CARTE A CIRCUIT IMPRIME SANS CONTACT ET PUCE ASSOCIEE | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2002 | Translation filed | 21.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 02.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4471345 (BARRETT JR RAYMOND L [US]); | [A]DE19526353 (STOBBE ANATOLI [DE]); | [X]US5680459 (HOOK CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al); | [X]US5698837 (FURUTA SHIGERU [JP]); | [A]US5777561 (CHIEU TRIEU CAN [US], et al); | [PX]EP1017005 (INTEGRATED SENSOR SOLUTIONS [US]); | International search | [Y]JPH05300166 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH07143142 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0869583 (TEC CORP); | [A]JPH08223081 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPH113407 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]JPH11134458 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) |