EP1221973 - CD40 antagonist for treating psoriasis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/29] | CD40 ANTAGONIST FOR TREATING PSORIASIS | ||
[2006/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHU, Keting 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | 02 /
WANG, Changyu 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00972003.8 | 02.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000US27184 | Priority number, date | US19990157461P | 04.10.1999 Original published format: US 157461 P | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0124823 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1221973 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1221973 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P17/06, A61P35/00, C07K16/28 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/29] | A61K39/395, A61P17/06, A61P35/00, // C07K16:28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CD40 Antagonist zur Behandlung von Psoriasis | [2006/52] | English: | CD40 antagonist for treating psoriasis | [2006/52] | French: | Antagonistes de CD40 permettant de traiter le psoriasis | [2006/52] |
Former [2002/29] | CD40 ANTAGONIST ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PSORIASIS | ||
Former [2002/29] | CD40 ANTAGONIST FOR TREATING PSORIASIS | ||
Former [2002/29] | ANTAGONISTES DE CD40 PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LE PSORIASIS | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07008815.8 / EP1839674 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.05.2007 | BE | 30.05.2007 | CY | 30.05.2007 | DK | 30.05.2007 | FI | 30.05.2007 | NL | 30.05.2007 | SE | 30.08.2007 | GR | 31.08.2007 | ES | 10.09.2007 | IE | 02.10.2007 | LU | 02.10.2007 | PT | 30.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
IE | 02.10.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
IE | 02.10.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 30.05.2007 | |
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 10.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9803670 (PANGENETICS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-21,23 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 12 * * example 1 * * claim 19 *; | [X]WO9839026 (BIOGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15,18-21,23 * page 2, lines 7-15 * * page 5, line 29 - page 8, line 18 * * claims 9,12-16 *; | [X]WO9912566 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,9-15,18-21,23 * page 16, line 20 - page 17, line 25 * * claim - *; | [PX]US6051228 (ARUFFO ALEJANDRO A [US], et al) [PX] 1-7,9-15,18-21,23 * column 3, lines 47-57 * * column 21, lines 25-31 *; | [X] - DENFELD RALF W ET AL, "CD40 is functionally expressed on human keratinocytes.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 26, no. 10, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 2329 - 2334, XP000978801 [X] 1-7,9-15,18-21,23 * abstract * * page 2330, column L, lines 19-23 * * page 2333, column L, paragraph 1 - page 2334, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830261009 | [X] - INGHIRAMI GIORGIO ET AL, "Phenotypic and functional characterization of T-BAM (CD40 ligand)+ T-cell non-Hodgkin's lymphoma.", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 84, no. 3, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 866 - 872, XP000978806 [X] 22 * page 866, column R, lines 17-21 * * page 870, column L, paragraph 3 * | [PX] - MAURI CLAUDIA ET AL, "Therapeutic activity of agonistic monoclonal antibodies against CD40 in a chronic autoimmune inflammatory process.", NATURE MEDICINE, (200006), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 673 - 679, XP002157458 [PX] 1-5,10-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/76251 |