EP1301252 - GAMING DEVICE AND METHOD OF PLAYING A GAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IGT 9295 Prototype Drive Reno, Nevada 89521-8986 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Colepat, LLC 10228 Angel Peak Court Las Vegas, NV 89134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLE, Joseph W. 7221 Sandy Plains Avenue Las Vegas, NV 89131 / US | 02 /
TARANTINO, Elia Rocco 3300 S. Decatur 10-210 Las Vegas, Nevada 89102 / US | [2003/27] |
Former [2003/16] | 01 /
COLE, Joseph W. 10228 Angel Peak Court Las Vegas, Nevada 89134 / US | ||
02 /
TARANTINO, Elia Rocco 3300 S. Decatur 10-210 Las Vegas, Nevada 89102 / US | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/16] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00972072.3 | 10.10.2000 | [2003/16] | WO2000US28080 | Priority number, date | US20000572711 | 16.05.2000 Original published format: US 572711 | US20000653049 | 01.09.2000 Original published format: US 653049 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0187441 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1301252 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
G07F17/3239 (EP,US);
G07F17/3244 (EP,US);
G07F17/3267 (EP,US);
G07F17/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIELGERAET UND VERFAHREN ZUM SPIELEN EINES SPIELES | [2003/16] | English: | GAMING DEVICE AND METHOD OF PLAYING A GAME | [2003/16] | French: | APPAREIL DE JEUX ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'Y JOUER | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/40] | 03.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5823874 (ADAMS WILLIAM R [US]) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [X]US4836546 (DIRE FELIX M [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5823874 (ADAMS WILLIAM R [US]); | [X]US4836546 (DIRE FELIX M [US], et al) |