EP1222351 - TACK ASSEMBLY FOR ELECTRONIC ARTICLE SURVEILLANCE TAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 6600 Congress Avenue Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | [2003/06] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 951 Yamato Road Boca Raton, Florida 33431-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Thang, Tat 22175 Cressmont Place Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US | 02 /
HOGAN, Dennis 4250 NE 26th Terrace Lighthouse Point, FL 33064 / US | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00972136.6 | 13.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000US28373 | Priority number, date | US19990420430 | 19.10.1999 Original published format: US 420430 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129354 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222351 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1222351 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05B73/00 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
E05B73/0017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKKNOPFVORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRONISCHES WARENÜBERWACHUNGSETIKETT | [2002/29] | English: | TACK ASSEMBLY FOR ELECTRONIC ARTICLE SURVEILLANCE TAGS | [2002/29] | French: | ENSEMBLE RIVET POUR ETIQUETTES DE SURVEILLANCE ELECTRONIQUE D'ARTICLES | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2539035 (JANK WILHELM) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12,15,16* page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0385540 (NEDAP NV [NL]) [X] 1-16 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 23; figures 1,2 * |