EP1257963 - AUCTION REDEMPTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yahoo!, Inc. 3400 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2002/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHURCHILL, Thomas 136-B Churchill Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
CONNELLY, John, Patrick 156 Dufour Street Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | 03 /
BOYD, Eric 3880 Rincon Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 04 /
PANCHAPAKESAN, Venkat 4581 Celia Court Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 05 /
GODIN, Seth 1 Bellair Drive Hastings on Hudson, NY 10706 / US | 06 /
SOHN, Henry, Hyunsuk 1550 Castilleja Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 07 /
CONWAY, David 1610 Begen Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Duhme, Torsten, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Duhme, Torsten, et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00972262.0 | 17.10.2000 | [2002/47] | WO2000US28816 | Priority number, date | US19990422114 | 20.10.1999 Original published format: US 422114 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129750 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257963 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F155/00, G06F17/60 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/47] | G06F155/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUKTIONSVERGÜTUNGSSYSTEM UND ûVERFAHREN | [2002/47] | English: | AUCTION REDEMPTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2002/47] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE RACHAT D'ENCHERES | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 29.09.2003 | Observations by third parties | 27.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.04.2010 | 29.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/46] | 13.07.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [YP]US5835896 (FISHER ALAN S [US], et al); | [Y]US5905975 (AUSUBEL LAWRENCE M [US]); | [Y]US5890138 (GODIN PAUL B [CA], et al) | other | - "3 Screenshots retrieved from the internet", URL: http://www.amun.org/amun_fundraising.html, XP002969013 |