EP1224577 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USER NAVIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Refusal of application | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Calcar Inc. 3511 Silverside Road, Suite 105 Wilmington Delaware 19810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states American Calcar Inc. 3511 Silverside Road, Suite 105 Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBRADOVICH, Michael, L. 1904 Avenida Salvatore San Clemente, CA 92672 / US | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Enskat, Michael Antony Frank Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Enskat, Michael Antony Frank Saunders & Dolleymore, 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00972367.7 | 27.10.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000US29520 | Priority number, date | US19990161860P | 27.10.1999 Original published format: US 161860 P | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0131510 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224577 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/9537 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99933 (US)
|
Former IPC [2002/30] | G06F17/30, G06F165/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR ANWENDERNAVIGATION | [2002/30] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USER NAVIGATION | [2002/30] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT A UN UTILISATEUR DE NAVIGUER | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 03.03.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/33] | 15.03.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP05004271.2 / EP1536351 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5948040 (DELORME DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * figures 1A,1B,1C,3,9 * * column 9, line 51 - line 54 * * column 18, line 65 - column 19, line 2 * * column 19, line 4 - line 8 * * column 19, line 63 - line 65 * * column 23, line 14 - line 29 * * column 28, line 56 - line 64 * * column 31, line 5 - line 15 * * column 34, line 26 - line 31 * * column 37, line 3 - line 30 * * column 56, line 1 - line 14 * * column 72, line 2 - line 7 * * column 73, line 18 - line 40 ** column 74, line 34 - column 75, line 12 * | International search | [X]US5802492 (DELORME DAVID M [US], et al) |