Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020054323 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19946744 | 29.09.1999 | DE0003462 | 28.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003516704 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19946744 | 29.09.1999 | DE0003462 | 28.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1222726 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19946744 | 29.09.1999 | DE0003462 | 28.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0124341 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19946744 | 29.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19946744 | 10.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19946744 | 29.09.1999 |