EP1222726 - METHOD FOR SAFELY COUPLING AN EXTERNAL VOLTAGE NETWORK TO A SERVICE VOLTAGE NETWORK AND CIRCUIT CONFIGURATION FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Logistics AG AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [2002/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMRAY, Bican Friedrichsstrasse 35 D-16321 Schönow / DE | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Peter, et al Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Hirsch, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00972612.6 | 28.09.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000DE03462 | Priority number, date | DE1999146744 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19946744 | [2002/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0124341 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222726 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/00, B60R16/02 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
F02N11/0866 (EP,KR);
F02N11/14 (EP,KR);
H02J1/122 (EP,KR);
H02J7/00304 (EP,KR);
H02J7/00308 (EP,KR);
H02J7/0034 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHEREN ANKOPPLUNG EINES FREMDSPANNUNGSNETZES AN EIN BETRIEBSSPANNUNGSNETZ UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2002/29] | English: | METHOD FOR SAFELY COUPLING AN EXTERNAL VOLTAGE NETWORK TO A SERVICE VOLTAGE NETWORK AND CIRCUIT CONFIGURATION FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2002/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE COUPLAGE FIABLE D'UN RESEAU DE DISTRIBUTION DE COURANT EXTERIEUR A UN RESEAU DE TENSION DE SERVICE ET CIRCUITERIE APPROPRIEE POUR METTRE LEDIT PROCEDE EN OEUVRE | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 31.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19719919 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19702116 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP0993996 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [XP] 1-12 * the whole document * |