EP1218385 - CARBON MONOXIDE SOURCE FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSITION-METAL-CARBONYL-COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT INC. 675 McDonnell Boulevard St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | [2009/02] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Mallinckrodt Inc. 675 McDonnell Boulevard St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBERTO, Roger, Ariel St. Georgenstrasse 54 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
SCHIBLI, Roger Weite Casse 28 5400 Baden / CH | [2002/37] |
Former [2002/27] | 01 /
ALBERTO, Roger, Ariel St. Georgenstrasse 54 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | ||
02 /
SCHIBLI, Roger Weite Gasse 28 5400 Baden / CH | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2006/28] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 60 Holly Walk Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 4JE / GB | ||
Former [2006/27] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 9 The Parade Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 5DG / GB | ||
Former [2002/27] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00972700.9 | 05.10.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000EP09856 | Priority number, date | EP19990203254 | 05.10.1999 Original published format: EP 99203254 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0125243 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218385 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1218385 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, C07F19/00 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
C07F5/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CARBONMONOXIDQUELLE FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ÜBERGANGSMETALLCARBONYLKOMPLEXEN | [2009/18] | English: | CARBON MONOXIDE SOURCE FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSITION-METAL-CARBONYL-COMPLEXES | [2002/27] | French: | SOURCE DE MONOXYDE DE CARBONE UTILE DANS LA PREPARATION DE COMPLEXES CARBONYLE/METAUX DE TRANSITION | [2002/27] |
Former [2002/27] | CARBONMONOXIDQUELLE FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ÜBERGANGSMETALLCARBONYLKOMPLEXE | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.01.2009 | PT | 08.06.2009 | IE | 05.10.2009 | LU | 05.10.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/21] | PT | 08.06.2009 | |
IE | 05.10.2009 | ||
LU | 05.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | PT | 08.06.2009 | |
IE | 05.10.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | PT | 08.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9848848 (MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document * |