EP1238053 - MOULDED FRAGRANCE BODIES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAATZ, Kathleen Kürnbergerstr. 105a 79650 Schopfheim / DE | 02 /
LAHN, Wolfgang Steinstr. 112 47877 Willich / DE | 03 /
BLOCK, Christian Wartburgplatz 12 50733 Köln / DE | 04 /
SCHAPER, Ulf-Armin Randstrasse 18 a 47804 Krefeld / DE | [2002/37] | Application number, filing date | 00972874.2 | 27.10.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000EP10579 | Priority number, date | DE1999153503 | 06.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19953503 | [2002/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0134751 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1238053 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/50, C11D17/00, C11D3/12, C11D3/22 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
C11D3/505 (EP);
C11D3/126 (EP);
C11D3/1273 (EP);
C11D3/128 (EP);
C11D3/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/37] | Title | German: | DUFTSTOFF-FORMKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2002/37] | English: | MOULDED FRAGRANCE BODIES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2002/37] | French: | CORPS MOULES DE PARFUM ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 04.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4536315 (GRAND PAUL S ET AL) [A] 1-18 * column 1, lines 15-22 * * column 3, lines 13-44 * * column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 10 * * column 7, lines 29-42 * * column 8, line 6 - column 9, line 47 * * column 10, lines 20-39; example -; claim - *; | [DA]DE19746780 (HENKEL KGAA) [DA] 1-18 * page 2, lines 3-7 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 64 * * page 6, line 45 - page 7, line 8; example -; claim - *; | [A]US5955419 (BARKET JR DENNIS JOSEPH ET AL) [A] 1-18 * column 1, lines 8-11 * * column 3, lines 8-16; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9812291 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-18 * page 1, lines 8-10 * * page 3, lines 4-7; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9951715 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-18 * example -; claim - * |