EP1222723 - CONNECTIONS AND TERMINATIONS FOR CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UTILX CORPORATION 22820 Russell Road Kent, WA 98032 / US | [2007/10] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states UTILX CORPORATION 22820 Rusell Road Kent, WA 98032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTINI, Glen, J. 6820 Water Street N.E. Tacoma, WA 98422 / US | 02 /
JENKINS, Kim 1155 Oakhill Place N.W. Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | 03 /
LANAN, Keith 13728 West Lake Kathleen Drive Renton, WA 98059 / US | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00973461.7 | 11.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000US28104 | Priority number, date | US19990155279P | 11.10.1999 Original published format: US 155279 P | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0128059 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222723 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1222723 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/24, H02G15/26, H01B7/28 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
H02G15/24 (EP,US);
H01B7/2813 (EP,US);
H02G15/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KABELVERBINDUNGEN SOWIE KABELENDVERSCHLÜSSE | [2002/29] | English: | CONNECTIONS AND TERMINATIONS FOR CABLES | [2002/29] | French: | CONNEXIONS ET TERMINAISONS POUR CABLES | [2004/52] |
Former [2002/29] | CONNEXIONS ET TERMINAISONS POUR C BLES | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Request for further processing for: | 02.07.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2007 | BE | 07.03.2007 | CH | 07.03.2007 | CY | 07.03.2007 | DK | 07.03.2007 | FI | 07.03.2007 | FR | 07.03.2007 | IT | 07.03.2007 | LI | 07.03.2007 | NL | 07.03.2007 | SE | 07.06.2007 | GR | 08.06.2007 | ES | 18.06.2007 | PT | 07.08.2007 | GB | 11.10.2007 | IE | 11.10.2007 | LU | 11.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
GB | 11.10.2007 | ||
IE | 11.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
GB | 11.10.2007 | ||
IE | 11.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
IE | 11.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
IE | 11.10.2007 | ||
FR | 26.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
FR | 26.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
FR | 26.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 07.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1846361 (SAYLOR ERNEST F); | [A]DE582168 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]US2248588 (SHANKLIN GEORGE B, et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1059527 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4545133 (FRYSZCZYN BOGDAN [US], et al); | [A]US4888886 (EAGER JR GEORGE S [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 2,3,7 *; | [A] - EAGER, JR. ET AL, "EXTENDINGSERVICE LIFE OF INSTALLED 15-35 KV EXTRUDED DIELECTRIC CABLES", IEEE RANSACTION ON POWER APPARATUS AND SYSTEMS, New York, (198408), vol. PAS-103, no. 8, pages 1997 - 2005, XP002155399 |