EP1235492 - ONLINE SCREEN CALIBRATION AND MEASURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Gluv Corporation Suite 405, Krystal Building, One Union Square Chattanooga, TN 37402 / US | [2002/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POWELL, Daryl, G. 2716 Autumn Chase Drive Chattanooga, TN 37421 / US | 02 /
DAVENPORT, Lanier, M. 412 Laurel Lane Lookout Mountain, TN 37350 / US | 03 /
ESPINOSA, Carol 1 Market Street, Apartment 306 Chattanooga, TN 37402 / US | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Wilson Gunn M'Caw 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00973887.3 | 26.10.2000 | [2002/36] | WO2000US29512 | Priority number, date | US19990434251 | 05.11.1999 Original published format: US 434251 | US20000567311 | 08.05.2000 Original published format: US 567311 | US20000592004 | 12.06.2000 Original published format: US 592004 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0133988 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1235492 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A43D1/02 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
A41D19/046 (EP);
A61B5/107 (EP);
G01B11/024 (EP);
A61B5/6825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/36] | Extension states | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ONLINE-BILDSCHIRMKALIBRIERUNG UND MESSVERFAHREN | [2002/36] | English: | ONLINE SCREEN CALIBRATION AND MEASURING METHOD | [2002/36] | French: | CALIBRATION SUR ECRAN EN LIGNE ET PROCEDE DE MESURE | [2002/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 01.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4745472 ; | [Y]US5539677 ; | [Y]EP0932139 |