EP1224643 - ADAPTIVE BANDWIDTH SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BROADCAST DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCube Corporation 1825 NW, 167th Place Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | [2002/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEERAN, Dan 924 88th Avenue NE Medina, WA 98039 / US | [2002/51] |
Former [2002/30] | 01 /
SHEERAN, Dan 2371 Lavender Hill Lane Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00973978.0 | 27.10.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000US29747 | Priority number, date | US19990163046P | 28.10.1999 Original published format: US 163046 P | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0131605 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224643 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1224643 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G08C15/00, H04Q11/00, H04L12/66, H04L12/56, H04J3/26, H04J3/17, H04B7/212, H04L12/43, H04J3/22 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
H04L47/805 (EP);
H04J3/1682 (EP);
H04L12/1877 (EP);
H04L12/2801 (EP);
H04L47/15 (EP);
H04L47/70 (EP);
H04L47/724 (EP);
H04L47/762 (EP);
H04L47/765 (EP);
H04L47/781 (EP);
H04L47/806 (EP);
H04L47/826 (EP);
H04N21/2385 (EP);
H04N21/25883 (EP);
H04N21/26216 (EP);
H04N21/6118 (EP);
H04N21/6373 (EP);
H04N21/6377 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT ADAPTIVER BANDBREITE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DATENRUNDSENDUNG | [2002/30] | English: | ADAPTIVE BANDWIDTH SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BROADCAST DATA | [2002/30] | French: | SYSTEME DE LARGEUR DE BANDE ADAPTATIVE ET PROCEDE DE DIFFUSION DE DONNEES | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Request for further processing for: | 18.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.2005 | Decision despatched | 19.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 19.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2006 | BE | 04.10.2006 | CH | 04.10.2006 | CY | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | LI | 04.10.2006 | NL | 04.10.2006 | DK | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0713347 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * figures 1-4,7,11,23 * * column 3, lines 5-22 * * column 8, lines 7-24 * * column 15, lines 36-55 * * column 19, line 40 - column 20, line 17 * * column 23, lines 4-18 * * column 27, lines 3-20 *; | [X]US5745837 (FUHRMANN AMIR MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,9,16 * abstract * * figures 39,43,45C * * column 43, lines 17-25 * * column 45, line 48 - column 46, line 8 * * column 46, lines 37-39 * * column 49, lines 4-9 *; | [A]US5822324 (KOSTRESKI BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 4,5,12,14 * abstract ** column 31, line 57 - column 32, line 48 *; | [Y]WO9909741 (NEXT LEVEL COMM [US]) [Y] 2-8,10-15,17-19 * abstract * * figures 1,3,5 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, lines 5-23 * * page 15, paragraph 3 * * page 16, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO9916247 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [A] 4,5,12,14 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * page 8, lines 12-30 * * page 10, lines 5-14 *; | [XY]US5940738 (RAO R PADMANABHA [US]) [X] 1,9,16 * abstract * * figures 1-4,8,11,13A-14 * * column 1, lines 13-31 * * column 2, lines 36-66 * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 35 * * column 6, lines 25-34 * * column 8, line 34 - column 9, line 9 * * column 9, lines 40-46 * * column 10, lines 50-64 * * column 15, line 5 - column 16, line 31 * * column 19, lines 6-44 * * column 20, lines 22-28 * * column 22, lines 10-29 * * column 22, lines 55-60 * [Y] 2-8,10-15,17-19 | International search | [X]US5745837 (FUHRMANN AMIR MICHAEL [US]); | [A]US5861919 (PERKINS MICHAEL [US], et al) |