Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 29.09.2010 | BE | | CH | | CY | Lapse: 29.09.2010 | DE | | DK | Lapse: 29.09.2010 | ES | | FI | Lapse: 29.09.2010 | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 30.12.2010 | IE | | IT | Lapse: 29.09.2010 | LI | | LU | Lapse: 26.10.2010 | MC | Lapse: 31.10.2010 | NL | | PT | | SE | Lapse: 29.09.2010 | Examination procedure | 12.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | | 27.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 27.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | European patent granted | 29.09.2010 | Opposition procedure | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2011 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 24.07.2002 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 24.07.2002 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20020427 | | Event date: | 24.07.2002 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Event date: | 10.03.2010 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 35/28 20060101AFI20100129BHEP | | Event date: | 10.03.2010 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C12N 5/077 20100101ALI20100129BHEP | | Event date: | 29.09.2010 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 29.09.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 30.09.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 29.10.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | SERVOPATENT GMBH | | Event date: | 11.11.2010 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60045034 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20101111 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 10.11.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 06.12.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20101126 | | Event date: | 31.01.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100929 | | Event date: | 31.01.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100929 | | Event date: | 31.03.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100929 | | Event date: | 31.03.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20101230 | | Event date: | 31.05.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100929 | | Event date: | 31.05.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20101031 | | Event date: | 01.02.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20110120 | | Event date: | 31.08.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100929 | | Event date: | 07.09.2011 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20110630 | | Event date: | 08.12.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 31.08.2012 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100929 | | Event date: | 28.09.2012 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20101026 | | Event date: | 27.10.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 60045034 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20110630 | | Event date: | 08.10.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 28.10.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 29.09.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 19.03.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60045034 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | ZSP PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE | | Event date: | 29.03.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PUE | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENT | OWNER: | MESOBLAST INTERNATIONAL SARL, CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: OSIRIS THERAPEUTICS, INC., US | | Event date: | 29.03.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PVP | Code Expl.: | PLEDGING | | Event date: | 19.03.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60045034 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | MESOBLAST INTERNATIONAL SARL, CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: OSIRIS THERAPEUTICS, INC., BALTIMORE, MD., US | | Event date: | 10.07.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES PC2A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSFER OF PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20180704 | | Event date: | 05.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | MESOBLAST INTERNATIONAL SARL; CH | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: OSIRIS THERAPEUTICS, INC. | Effective DATE: | 20180702 | | Event date: | 12.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20180816 AND 20180822 | | Event date: | 10.07.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES PC2A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSFER OF PATENT | OWNER: | MESOBLAST INTERNATIONAL SARL | Effective DATE: | 20180704 | | Event date: | 28.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 16.11.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | OWNER: | MESOBLAST INTERNATIONAL SARL, CH | Effective DATE: | 20181016 | | Event date: | 16.11.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CA | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF ADDRESS | Effective DATE: | 20181016 | | Event date: | 25.10.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | MESOBLAST INTERNATIONAL SARL; CH | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CESSION; FORMER OWNER NAME: OSIRIS THERAPEUTICS, INC. | Effective DATE: | 20180802 | | Event date: | 31.10.2019 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20190927 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 19.03.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60045034 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | ZWICKER SCHNAPPAUF & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PA, DE | | Event date: | 21.11.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60045034 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | ZWICKER SCHNAPPAUF & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PA, DE | | Event date: | 29.11.2019 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20190926 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.11.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | SERVOPATENT GMBH, CH | | Event date: | 31.01.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20191010 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20191017 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20191014 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20191015 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 28.02.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20191104 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.03.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20191015 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20191024 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 15.06.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PCAR | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE | Free Format Text: | NEW ADDRESS: WANNERSTRASSE 9/1, 8045 ZUERICH (CH) | | Event date: | 26.10.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 60045034 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 28.10.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20201025 | | Event date: | 13.11.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 18.11.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20201025 | | Event date: | 25.11.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MK9A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED | | Event date: | 04.12.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20201026 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20201026 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20201104 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20201025 | | Event date: | 27.08.2010 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 24.08.2010 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 02.04.2010 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 07.06.2002 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 05.08.2011 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 05.08.2011 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 28.01.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20220128 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20201027 | |