EP1210062 - INCREASED PEROXIDE CONTENT TOOTH BLEACHING GEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Discus Dental, LLC 8550 Higuera Street Culver City, CA 90232 / US | [2009/41] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Discus Dental Inc. 8550 Higuera Street Culver City, California 90232 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLICO, Michael, A. 314 Palisades Avenue Santa Monica, CA 90402 / US | [2002/34] |
Former [2002/23] | 01 /
PELLICO, Michael, A. 3024 Military Lane Los Angeles, CA 90272 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00974089.5 | 11.09.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000US40861 | Priority number, date | US19990153162P | 09.09.1999 Original published format: US 153162 P | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0117481 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1210062 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16, A61K7/18, A61K7/20 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAHNBLEICHGEL MIT ERHÖHTEM PEROXIDGEHALT | [2002/23] | English: | INCREASED PEROXIDE CONTENT TOOTH BLEACHING GEL | [2002/23] | French: | AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT DENTAIRE A TENEUR ACCRUE EN PEROXYDE | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/50] | 08.04.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.09.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/50] | Appeal following examination | 18.06.2008 | Appeal received No. T1846/08 | 18.08.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.09.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 08.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.09.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4687663 (SCHAEFFER HANS A [US]) [Y] 1-34* column 2, line 4 - line 24; example -; claim - *; | [Y]US4990089 (MUNRO JOHN R [US]) [Y] 1-34 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 20; claims 1-4 *; | USRE34196E [ ] (MUNRO JOHN R); | [Y]US5648064 (GAFFAR ABDUL [US], et al) [Y] 1-34 * column 2, line 38 - line 46; examples 1,2; claims 1-3,8-10 * * column 3, line 24 - line 35 *; | [XY]US5858332 (JENSEN STEVEN D [US], et al) [X] 16 * column 5, line 50 - line 65; claims 1,3,4,7-9,12,14,16,24 * [Y] 1-15,17-34; | [Y]US5902568 (RYLES CHRISTINE WATSON [US], et al) [Y] 1-34 * column 3, line 5 - line 20; example -; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]US5928628 (PELLICO MICHAEL A [US]) [Y] 1-34 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 8; example -; claims 1-4 * | International search | [A]US5855870 (FISCHER DAN E [US]); | [AP]US6036943 (FISCHER DAN E [US]); | [AP]US6106812 (PRENCIPE MICHAEL [US], et al); | [AP]US6110446 (PRENCIPE MICHAEL [US], et al) |