EP1224722 - SEMICONDUCTOR FUSE FOR ELECTRICAL CONSUMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/10] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEHLICKA, Joerg Lindenstrasse 8 71634 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
WAGNER, Arndt Hagstrasse 29 D-71735 Eberdingen / DE | [2002/30] | Application number, filing date | 00974284.2 | 01.09.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000DE03030 | Priority number, date | DE1999141699 | 02.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19941699 | [2002/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0117090 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224722 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1224722 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/00, H02J7/00 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
H03K17/30 (EP,US);
H02H3/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSICHERUNG FÜR ELEKTRISCHE VERBRAUCHER | [2002/30] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR FUSE FOR ELECTRICAL CONSUMERS | [2002/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF COUPE-CIRCUIT A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR POUR CONSOMMATEURS ELECTRIQUES | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.03.2009 | DK | 04.03.2009 | FI | 04.03.2009 | IE | 04.03.2009 | NL | 04.03.2009 | GR | 05.06.2009 | PT | 18.08.2009 | AT | 01.09.2009 | LU | 01.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/21] | DK | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
AT | 01.09.2009 | ||
LU | 01.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | DK | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
AT | 01.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | DK | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | DK | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | FI | 04.03.2009 | |
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | FI | 04.03.2009 | |
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 04.03.2009 | |
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 04.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE19645944 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5945745 (MACKS HAROLD RYAN [US]) [A] 1-4* column 3, paragraph 2; figure 2 * |