EP1224812 - UNIT HOUSING CELL EQUIPMENT FOR CELLULAR TELEPHONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Belgacom Mobile S.A. Vooruitgangstraat 55 1210 Brussels / BE | [2002/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINKX, Philip N.V. Belgacom Mobile S.A., Vooruitgangstraat 55 B-1210 Brussels / BE | 02 /
BAUWERAERTS, Koen N.V. Belgacom Mobile S.A., Vooruitgangstraat 55 B-1210 Brussels / BE | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | van Straaten, Joop Office Kirkpatrick Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Van Straaten, Joop OFFICE KIRKPATRICK S.A., Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | Application number, filing date | 00974485.5 | 26.10.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000EP10679 | Priority number, date | EP19990203561 | 28.10.1999 Original published format: EP 99203561 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0131931 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224812 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1224812 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/02, H04Q1/10, H05K5/00, H05K7/18, H02B1/30 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
H05K9/0062 (EP);
H04Q1/023 (EP);
H04Q1/026 (EP);
H04Q1/035 (EP);
H04M2207/18 (EP);
H04Q2201/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINHEIT ZUM UNTERBRINGEN VON MOBILFUNK AUSRÜSTUNG | [2002/30] | English: | UNIT HOUSING CELL EQUIPMENT FOR CELLULAR TELEPHONES | [2002/30] | French: | UNITE ABRITANT LES EQUIPEMENTS CELLULAIRES DESTINES AUX TELEPHONES CELLULAIRES | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 23.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.12.2004 | DK | 22.03.2005 | GR | 22.03.2005 | SE | 22.03.2005 | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/12] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 22.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5398159 (ANDERSSON NILS A T [SE], et al) [X] 1,6,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 60 * * column 7, line 15 - line 30 ** column 10, line 37 - line 69 *; | [X]WO9847339 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * abstract * * page 11, line 15 - page 15, line 2; figure 2 * |