EP1242987 - REAL-TIME TRACKING AND MANAGEMENT OF LAND-BASED VEHICLES ON AIRPORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHESTVO "EAST LINE-HANDLING"; AEROPORT "DOMODEDOVO", DOMODEDOVSKY R-N MOSKOVSKAYA OBL., 142045 / RU | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEGODJUK, Valery Vasilievich ul. Tallinskaya, 24-487 Moscow, 123458 / RU | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Shaw, Matthew Nigel, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Shaw, Matthew Nigel, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | Lally, William FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00975051.4 | 18.10.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000RU00413 | Priority number, date | RU19990126409 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: RU 99126409 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146934 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242987 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/06, G08G1/123 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
G08G5/0082 (EP,US);
G08G5/06 (KR);
G08G1/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/39] | G08G5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ECHTZEITFOLGE- UND MANAGEMENTSYSTEM FÜR LANDFAHRZEUGE AUF FLUGHÄFEN | [2006/23] | English: | REAL-TIME TRACKING AND MANAGEMENT OF LAND-BASED VEHICLES ON AIRPORTS | [2002/39] | French: | LOCALISATION ET GESTION EN TEMPS REEL DE VEHICULES TERRESTRES SITUES SUR DES AEROPORTS | [2006/23] |
Former [2002/39] | ECHTZEITFOLGE- UND MANAGEMENTSYSTEM FÜR SICH BEWEGENDE FAHRZEUGE AUF FLUGHÄFEN | ||
Former [2002/39] | LOCALISATION EN TEMPS REEL DE VEHICULES TERRESTRES SITUES SUR DES AEROPORTS | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 17.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 29.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/12] | 31.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0509777 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2271692 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]); | [YA]WO9908251 (NASA [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,13 * the whole document * [A] 3-12; | [YA]EP0921511 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [Y] 1,2,13 * the whole document * [A] 3-12 |