EP1247130 - CONTACT LENS WITH LIGHT FILTERING FOR OUTDOOR SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peakvision, LLC P.O. Box 70741 Nashville, TN 37215 / US | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERNS, David, V., Jr. PO Box 920366 Needham, MA 02492 / US | 02 /
MOORE, J., Paul 12704 Linden Leawood, KS 66209 / US | [2002/47] |
Former [2002/41] | 01 /
KERNS, David, V., Jr. 145 Black Bear Drive, 2021 Waltham, MA 02451 / US | ||
02 /
MOORE, J., Paul 12704 Linden Leawood, KS 66209 / US | Representative(s) | Strachan, Victoria Jane, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Strachan, Victoria Jane, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Alexandra House, 1 Alexandra Road Swansea SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 00975400.3 | 26.10.2000 | [2002/41] | WO2000US29506 | Priority number, date | US19990453379 | 02.12.1999 Original published format: US 453379 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0140842 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1247130 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/04, G02C7/04, G02C7/10 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G02C7/105 (EP,US);
G02C7/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/41] | G02B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKTLINSE MIT LICHTFILTERUNG FÜR FRISCHLUFTSPORT- UND FREIZEITAKTIVITÄTEN | [2002/41] | English: | CONTACT LENS WITH LIGHT FILTERING FOR OUTDOOR SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES | [2002/41] | French: | LENTILLE DE CONTACT POURVUE D'UN FILTRAGE DE LUMIERE POUR LES ACTIVITES DE SPORTS ET DE LOISIRS DE PLEIN AIR | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/20] | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/20] | Request for further processing for: | 06.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5617154 (HOFFMAN WILLIAM C [US]); | [X]US5592245 (MOORE J PAUL [US], et al); | [X]US4666640 (NEEFE CHARLES W [US]); | [X]US4576453 (BOROWSKY RICHARD [US]) |