EP1234015 - DELIVERY SYSTEM HAVING ENCAPSULATED POROUS CARRIER LOADED WITH ADDITIVES, PARTICULARLY DETERGENT ADDITIVES SUCH AS PERFUMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARIN, E.M. Paseo de Laureles 404, Dpto Bosques dede las Lomas Mexico City, 11700 / MX | 02 /
VELAZQUEZ, J.M. Acueducto de Puente Grande No.56, Paseos d' Bosque Naucalpan, México 53278 / MX | 03 /
DIHORA, J.O. 4521 Randall Drive Hamilton, OH 45011 / US | 04 /
GARCIAGONZALEZ, R. Barranca de Cobre St. 253-B, Fracc. los Pirules Tlalnepantla, México 54040 / MX | 05 /
SAINI, Gaurav 1-4-127-506, Koyocho-Naka, Higashinada-ku Kobe 658-0032 / JP | [2002/48] |
Former [2002/35] | 01 /
MARIN, E.M. Paseo de Laureles 404, Dpto Bosques dede las Lomas Mexico City, 11700 / MX | ||
02 /
VELAZQUEZ, J.M. Acueducto de Puente Grande No.56, Paseos d' Bosque Naucalpan, México 53278 / MX | |||
03 /
DIHORA, J.O. Apartment 304, 5720 Winton Road Cincinnati, OH 45232 / US | |||
04 /
GARCIAGONZALEZ, R. Barranca de Cobre St. 253-B, Fracc. los Pirules Tlalnepantla, México 54040 / MX | |||
05 /
SAINI, Gaurav 1-4-127-506, Koyocho-Naka, Higashinada-ku Kobe 658-0032 / JP | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00976207.1 | 27.11.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000IB01755 | Priority number, date | US19990169024P | 03.12.1999 Original published format: US 169024 P | US20000208629P | 01.06.2000 Original published format: US 208629 P | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0140430 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1234015 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D3/50, C11D3/12, C11D3/22 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
C11D3/222 (EP);
C11D17/00 (KR);
C11D17/0039 (EP);
C11D3/128 (EP);
C11D3/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FREISETZUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINGEKAPSELTEN ZUSATZBELADENEN PORÖSEN TRÄGERN, INSBESONDERE WASCHMITTELZUSÄTZE WIE DUFTSTOFFE | [2002/35] | English: | DELIVERY SYSTEM HAVING ENCAPSULATED POROUS CARRIER LOADED WITH ADDITIVES, PARTICULARLY DETERGENT ADDITIVES SUCH AS PERFUMES | [2002/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE LIBERATION DOTE D'UN SUPPORT POREUX ENCAPSULE CHARGE D'ADDITIFS, NOTAMMENT D'ADDITIFS DETERGENTS TELS QUE DES PARFUMS | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/43] | 12.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 04.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 04.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9711151 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-13* page 13, line 5 - line 16; examples I,II; claims 1-8 *; | [DA]WO9734982 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [DA] 1-13 * claims 1-5,9 *; | [A]WO9955819 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 7 - line 22; example -; claims 1,4 * |