EP1152040 - COATING SOLUTION FOR FORMING TRANSPARENT AND CONDUCTIVE TIN OXIDE FILM AND METHOD FOR PREPARING TRANSPARENT AND CONDUCTIVE TIN OXIDE FILM, AND TRANSPARENT AND CONDUCTIVE TIN OXIDE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO GOSEI KOGYO CO., LTD. 1603, Kamimyoden Ichikawa-shi Chiba 272-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Toyo Gosei Kogyo Co., Ltd. 1603, Kamimyoden Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIUME, Kazuma, Toyo Gosei Kogyo Co. Ltd. 1603, Kamimyoden Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-0012 / JP | 02 /
UTIDA, Takasi, Photosensitive Mat. Res. Lab. Toyo Gosei Kogyo Co. Ltd., 3805, Hagiwari, Inba-mura IInba-gun, Chiba 270-1601 / JP | 03 /
KIMURA, Masateru, Toyo Gosei Kogyo Co. Ltd. 1603, Kamimyoden Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-0012 / JP | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2001/45] | Application number, filing date | 00976299.8 | 17.11.2000 | [2001/45] | WO2000JP08095 | Priority number, date | JP19990326634 | 17.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32663499 | JP20000344339 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000344339 | [2001/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0136544 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152040 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09D1/00, C09D5/24, C03C17/25, C01G19/02, G02F1/1343, H01B13/00, H01B5/14 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
B05D3/007 (KR);
C03C17/253 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/22 (KR);
C08K5/17 (KR);
C09D5/24 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/61 (KR);
C09D7/63 (KR);
C09D7/65 (KR);
C03C2217/211 (EP,US);
C03C2218/11 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2231 (KR);
G02F1/13439 (EP,US);
Y10S524/91 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/45] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSLÖSUNG ZUR BILDUNG EINES TRANSPARENTEN UND LEITFÄHIGEN ZINNOXYD-FILMES, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN UND SO ERHALTENER FILM | [2001/45] | English: | COATING SOLUTION FOR FORMING TRANSPARENT AND CONDUCTIVE TIN OXIDE FILM AND METHOD FOR PREPARING TRANSPARENT AND CONDUCTIVE TIN OXIDE FILM, AND TRANSPARENT AND CONDUCTIVE TIN OXIDE FILM | [2001/45] | French: | SOLUTION D'ENDUCTION PERMETTANT DE FORMER UN FILM D'OXYDE D'ETAIN TRANSPARENT ET CONDUCTEUR, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CE FILM ET FILM D'OXYDE D'ETAIN TRANSPARENT ET CONDUCTEUR | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2001 | Translation filed | 14.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 02.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH01257129 (TAKI CHEMICAL); | [Y]JPS62278705 (TAKI CHEMICAL); | [Y]US5855820 (CHAN MAN-SHEUNG [US], et al); | [Y]JPH07242842 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]JPH06345430 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) |