Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003529338 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US16301899 | 02.11.1999 | US0029852 | 31.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU783313B | Global Dossier | 13.10.2005 | B2 | AU1443601 | 14.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US16301899 | 02.11.1999 | US0029852 | 31.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1244698 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16301899 | 02.11.1999 | US0029852 | 31.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2390182 | 10.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16301899 | 02.11.1999 | US0029852 | 31.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7268222 | 11.09.2007 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US70325300 | 31.10.2000 | US16301899 | 02.11.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0132706 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2002 | A3 | WO0132706 | 10.05.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16301899 | 02.11.1999 |