|
25.08.2010 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2009 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2009 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
04.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.05.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
19 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |