EP1246841 - TRANSCRIPTION FACTORS CONTAINING TWO POTENTIAL DNA BINDING MOTIFS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED Ewert House, Ewert Place Summertown Oxford OX2 7SG / GB | [2006/38] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED Ewert House, Ewert Place Summertown, Oxford OX2 7BZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANHAM, Alison, Hilary, University of Oxford Level 5, Room 5501, John Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxfordshire OX3 9DU / GB | 02 /
CORDELL, Jacqueline, Loelia, University of Oxford Level 5, Room 5501, Jon Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxfordshire OX3 9DU / GB | 03 /
JONES, Margaret, University of Oxford Level 5, Room 5501, John Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxfordshire OX3 9DU / GB | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00977763.2 | 01.12.2000 | [2002/41] | WO2000GB04590 | Priority number, date | GB19990028543 | 02.12.1999 Original published format: GB 9928543 | GB20000017042 | 11.07.2000 Original published format: GB 0017042 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0140303 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1246841 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1246841 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C12N15/12, C07K16/18, A61K38/17, A61K39/00, G01N33/53, G01N33/68, C12Q1/68 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSKRIPTIONSFAKTOREN WELCHE ZWEI POTENTIELLE DNA BINDENDE MOTIVE ENTHALTEN | [2002/41] | English: | TRANSCRIPTION FACTORS CONTAINING TWO POTENTIAL DNA BINDING MOTIFS | [2002/41] | French: | FACTEURS DE TRANSCRIPTION CONTENANT DEUX MOTIFS DE LIAISON A L'ADN POTENTIELS | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2006 | BE | 20.09.2006 | CH | 20.09.2006 | CY | 20.09.2006 | FI | 20.09.2006 | IT | 20.09.2006 | LI | 20.09.2006 | NL | 20.09.2006 | TR | 20.09.2006 | IE | 01.12.2006 | LU | 01.12.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | SE | 20.12.2006 | GR | 21.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | PT | 12.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
TR | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 01.12.2006 | ||
LU | 01.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 01.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 01.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9955858 (METAGEN GESELLSCHAFT FUER GENOMFORSCHUNG MBH [DE], et al) [X] 13-15 * SEQ ID NO: 95 and 613 *; | [X] - MARRA M ET AL, "mj26a02.r1 Soares mouse embryo cDNA clone", EMBL, (19970114), XP002163657 [X] 13-15 * abstract * | [X] - FERBUS D ET AL, "PRODUCTION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF MOUSE MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES TO HUMAN ZINC FINGER OZF PROTEIN OVEREXPRESSED IN PANCREATIC CARCINOMAS", HYBRIDOMA, (1999), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 431 - 436, XP000870286 [X] 18,20,21 * the whole document * | [A] - BURLEY STEPHEN K, "DNA-binding motifs from eukaryotic transcription factors.", CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 0959-440X, pages 3 - 11, XP000985676 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-440X(94)90053-1 | [A] - ADCOCK IM, BARNES PJ, "Transcription Factors", ASTHMA, (1997), vol. 1, pages 337 - 350, XP000985655 [A] * the whole document * | [PX] - BANHAM AH ET AL., "FOXP1 a novel candidate tumor suppressor gene on chromosome 3p", CANCER DETECTION AND PREVENTION ONLINE, (200010), URL: http://www.cancerprev.org/Meetings/2000/Abstracts/Show?Num=186, (20010316), XP002163656 [PX] 1-47 * abstract * |