EP1241519 - PROJECTION DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGISHI, Shigekazu 13-304-402, Nasahara 1-chome Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1041 / JP | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Stippl, Hubert, et al Patentanwälte Freiligrathstrasse 7a 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Stippl, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Freiligrathstrasse 7a 90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | Stippl, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00977989.3 | 28.11.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000JP08380 | Priority number, date | JP19990360252 | 20.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36025299 | [2002/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146754 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241519 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1241519 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/00, H04N9/31 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
G02B27/1046 (EP,US);
G02B27/126 (EP,US);
G02B27/145 (EP,US);
G02B5/04 (EP,US);
H04N9/3105 (EP,US);
H04N9/3167 (EP,US);
H04N5/7441 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | G03B21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSSCHIRM | [2002/38] | English: | PROJECTION DISPLAY | [2002/38] | French: | ECRAN DE PROJECTION | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2002 | Translation filed | 04.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 28.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0435288 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 2-7,10-14 * column 9, line 53 - column 12, line 47 * | International search | [X]JPH03202845 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH0850227 (CANON KK) |