Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020058077 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0008516 | 01.12.2000 | JP34445099 | 03.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1556601 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0008516 | 01.12.2000 | JP34445099 | 03.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1234834 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2003 | A4 | EP1234834 | 28.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0008516 | 01.12.2000 | JP34445099 | 03.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0140263 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP34445099 | 03.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003087831 | 08.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP34445099 | 03.12.1999 |