EP1234834 - 1,3,4-OXADIAZOLIN-2-ONE DERIVATIVES AND DRUGS CONTAINING THESE DERIVATIVES AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHMOTO, Kazuyuk, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-858 / JP | 02 /
OKUMA, Motohiro, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-858 / JP | 03 /
SEKIOKA, Tomohiko, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-858 / JP | [2002/47] |
Former [2002/35] | 01 /
OHMOTO, Kazuyuk, Minase Research Institute Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho, Mishima-gun Osaka 618-858 / JP | ||
02 /
OKUMA, Motohiro, Minase Research Institute Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho, Mishima-gun Osaka 618-858 / JP | |||
03 /
SEKIOKA, Tomohiko, Minase Research Institute Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho, Mishima-gun Osaka 618-858 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00978052.9 | 01.12.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000JP08516 | Priority number, date | JP19990344450 | 03.12.1999 Original published format: JP 34445099 | [2002/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0140263 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1234834 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/083, A61K38/06, A61P1/02, A61P1/04, A61P9/10, A61P11/00, A61P29/00, A61P43/00 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
C07K5/1027 (EP,US);
C07K5/0804 (KR);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K5/101 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DERIVATE DES 1,3,4-OXADIAZOLIN-2-ON UND MEDIKAMENTE, DIE DIESE DERIVATE ALS AKTIVE SUBSTANZEN ENTHALTEN | [2002/35] | English: | 1,3,4-OXADIAZOLIN-2-ONE DERIVATIVES AND DRUGS CONTAINING THESE DERIVATIVES AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2002/35] | French: | DERIVES DE 1,3,4-OXADIAZOLINE-2-ONE ET MEDICAMENTS CONTENANT CES DERIVES UTILES COMME INGREDIENT ACTIF | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2002 | Translation filed | 28.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 31.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/40] | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1234820 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1,2* page 26, formula (I-1f) * | International search | [A]WO9824806 (CORTECH INC [US], et al); | [A] - MACIEJ WIECZOREK ET AL., "Biochemical characterization of alpha-ketooxadiazole inhibitors of elastases", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, (1999), vol. 367, no. 2, pages 193 - 201, XP002937402 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abbi.1999.1249 |