Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
29.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] |
15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
14.01.2003 | Change - extension states | |
03.01.2003 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
13.12.2002 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
13.12.2002 | Change - classification | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
02.08.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
02.08.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
24.07.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.07.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.06.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.06.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.09.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.05.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.12.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication |