EP1239749 - DEVICE FOR APPLYING GLITTER PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang, Charles 55 Westview Road Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | [2002/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Mittler, Enrico c/o Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00978453.9 | 09.11.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000US30787 | Priority number, date | US19990438233 | 12.11.1999 Original published format: US 438233 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0133992 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239749 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A45D29/00, A45D29/20, A45D29/18, A45D40/26, A46B11/00, A45D33/02 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
A45D29/00 (EP,US);
A45D34/045 (EP,US);
A45D34/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | A45D29/00, A45D29/20, A45D29/18, A45D40/26, A46B11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON GLITZERNDEN PARTIKELN | [2002/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR APPLYING GLITTER PARTICLES | [2002/38] | French: | APPLICATEUR DE PARTICULES BRILLANTES | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 07.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/42] | 23.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5513781 (ULLRICH JEFFREY F [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5551608 (MOORE DAVID N [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5657778 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2722380 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2738126 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5657778 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]); | [Y]US5964226 (SOBEL JOAN LASKER [US]); | [YP]US6062757 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]); | [AP]US6059473 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS [FR]) |