EP1233966 - HYDROMORPHINONE AND HYDROCODEINONE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THEIR SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park Illinois 60064 / US | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARCLERODE, William, H. 335 Strotz Road Asbury, NJ 08802 / US | 02 /
GAULT, Robert 832 N. Renaud Gross Pointe Woods, MI 48236 / US | 03 /
SANDISON, Mark, D. 900 Crescent Drive Dearborn, MI 48124 / US | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/35] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00978498.4 | 09.11.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000US30931 | Priority number, date | US19990164364P | 09.11.1999 Original published format: US 164364 P | US19990164536P | 09.11.1999 Original published format: US 164536 P | US19990164505P | 09.11.1999 Original published format: US 164505 P | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0134608 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233966 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233966 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1233966 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D489/02, A61K31/485, A61P25/04 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
C07D489/02 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/11] |
Former [2002/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Extension states | AL | 10.05.2002 | LT | 10.05.2002 | LV | 10.05.2002 | MK | 10.05.2002 | RO | 10.05.2002 | SI | 10.05.2002 | Title | German: | HYDROMORPHINONE AND HYDROCODEINONE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THEIR SYNTHESIS | [2002/35] | English: | HYDROMORPHINONE AND HYDROCODEINONE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THEIR SYNTHESIS | [2002/35] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'HYDROMORPHINONE ET D'HYDROCODEINONE, PROCEDES DE SYNTHESE DE CES DERNIERES | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 21.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08157739.7 / EP2003134 | EP10171268.5 / EP2338891 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Bachelin, Karl Martin Raimund Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Bachelin, Karl Martin Raimund Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 05.06.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.12.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.12.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.09.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2008 | BE | 30.07.2008 | CY | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | FI | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | IE | 09.11.2008 | LU | 09.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CY | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
TR | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.11.2008 | ||
LU | 09.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CY | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.11.2008 | ||
LU | 09.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.11.2008 | ||
LU | 09.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 30.07.2008 | |
PT | 30.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]GB285404 (C. H. BOEHRINGER SOHN) [DA] 1-44 * claims 1-9 *; | [DA]US2654756 (HOMEYER AUGUST H, et al) [DA] 1-44* claims 1-11 *; | [A]WO9805667 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [A] 1-44 * claims 1-11 *; | [A] - M. P. KOTICK, "Analgesic Narcotic Antagonists. 6. 7beta,8beta-Methano- and 7b,8b-Epoxydihydrocodeinone", J. MED. CHEM., (1981), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 722 - 726, XP000983418 [A] 1-44 * Scheme II: synthesis of compound 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00138a016 | [A] - S. YAMANO ET AL., "In vivo and in vitro formation of morphinone from morphine in rat", XENOBIOTICA, (1997), vol. 27, no. 7, pages 645 - 656, XP000983513 [A] 1-44 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/004982597240244 | Opposition | DE607931 | DE617238 |