EP1282527 - COLLECTALBUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuverink, Arend Jan Mallemse Molenweg 11 7152 AT Eibergen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states Leuverink, Arend Jan Mallumse Molenweg 11 7152 AT Eibergen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/07] | Application number, filing date | 00980074.9 | 20.10.2000 | [2003/07] | WO2000NL00763 | Priority number, date | NL19991013426 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: NL 1013426 | [2003/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0130587 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1282527 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B42D1/08, B42F13/12, B42F11/00 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
B42D1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAMMELALBUM | [2003/07] | English: | COLLECTALBUM | [2003/07] | French: | ALBUM | [2003/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2001 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 03.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/46] | 13.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5002417 (HSU C S JUNIOR [TW]) [AD] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0438034 (STANCATO ENZO [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 21 - column 18, line 51; figures 1-20 * | by applicant | US5002417 |