EP1227860 - METHOD FOR THE DEGRADATION AND THE REMOVAL OF HALOGENATED AND AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS FROM MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/32] | METHOD FOR THE DEMOLITION AND THE REMOVAL OF HALOGENATED AND AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS FROM MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN THEM | ||
[2004/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiror B.V. "Rivierstaete" Building, Amsteldijk 166 1079 LH Amsterdam / NL | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNINI, Aldo Via Alla Selva 6 CH-6933 Muzzano / CH | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2002/32] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00980121.8 | 13.11.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000NL00827 | Priority number, date | NL19991013558 | 11.11.1999 Original published format: NL 1013558 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0134245 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227860 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A62D3/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
A62D3/34 (EP);
A62D2101/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABBRUCH UND ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON HALOGENIERTEN UND AROMATISCHEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN AUS DIESEN ENTHALTENDEN MITTELN | [2002/32] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DEGRADATION AND THE REMOVAL OF HALOGENATED AND AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS FROM MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN THEM | [2004/50] | French: | METHODE DE DESTRUCTION ET D'ELIMINATION D'HYDROCARBURES HALOGENES ET AROMATIQUES DANS DES MATERIAUX LES RENFERMANT | [2002/32] |
Former [2002/32] | METHOD FOR THE DEMOLITION AND THE REMOVAL OF HALOGENATED AND AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS FROM MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN THEM | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 02.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH07265461 ; | [X]US5197823 (CUTSHALL EULE R ET AL) [X] 1-7 * column 4, lines 21-24 * * column 7, lines 3-7; claim - *; | [Y]US5362402 (HAITKO DEBORAH A ET AL) [Y] 1-7 * column 3, lines 22-25,60-64; claim - *; | [A]US5362404 (HAITKO DEBORAH A) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 1,2,8-16,32-35 *; | [A]DE3410239 (HIVOLIN GMBH) [A] 1 * example 3 *; | [A]DE3810707 (MANDL JOHANNES) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 50, Database accession no. 1995-388850, XP002142536 & JPH07265461 A 19951017 (EBARA CORP) [X] 1,5-7 * abstract * | [Y] - EYKHOLT G R ET AL, "DECHLORINATION OF THE CHLOROACETANILIDE HERBICIDES ALACHLOR AND METOLACHLOR BY IRON METAL", ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, (19980515), vol. 32, no. 10, ISSN 0013-936X, pages 1482 - 1487, XP000751673 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/es970678n |