EP1236004 - DEVICE FOR DISTRIBUTION IN A VENTILATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Öyen, Sverre Gragasveien 10 3142 Vestskogen / NO | [2004/29] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Oyen, Sverre Gragasveien 10 3142 Vestskogen / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Lundquist, Lars-Olof L-O Lundquist Patentbyra AB Box 80 651 03 Karlstad / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Lundquist, Lars-Olof L-O Lundquist Patentbyra AB, Box 80 651 03 Karlstad / SE | Application number, filing date | 00980134.1 | 05.12.2000 | [2002/36] | WO2000NO00414 | Priority number, date | NO19990005995 | 06.12.1999 Original published format: NO 995995 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0140698 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1236004 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1236004 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/00 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
F16L41/03 (EP);
F24F13/0236 (EP);
F24F13/029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTEILERVORRICHTUNG IN EINEM BELÜFTUNGSSYSTEM | [2002/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISTRIBUTION IN A VENTILATION SYSTEM | [2002/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REPARTITION DANS UN SYSTEME DE VENTILATION | [2004/05] |
Former [2002/36] | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DANS UN SYSTEME DE VENTILATION | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2004 | BE | 14.07.2004 | CH | 14.07.2004 | CY | 14.07.2004 | FI | 14.07.2004 | FR | 14.07.2004 | IT | 14.07.2004 | LI | 14.07.2004 | NL | 14.07.2004 | TR | 14.07.2004 | GR | 14.10.2004 | ES | 25.10.2004 | GB | 05.12.2004 | LU | 05.12.2004 | IE | 06.12.2004 | PT | 14.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
CY | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
FR | 14.07.2004 | ||
IT | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
TR | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
GB | 05.12.2004 | ||
LU | 05.12.2004 | ||
IE | 06.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
CY | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
FR | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
TR | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
GB | 05.12.2004 | ||
LU | 05.12.2004 | ||
IE | 06.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
FR | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
TR | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
GB | 05.12.2004 | ||
IE | 06.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
FR | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
GB | 05.12.2004 | ||
IE | 06.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
GB | 05.12.2004 | ||
IE | 06.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
GB | 05.12.2004 | ||
IE | 06.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 14.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1265337 ; | [A]CH538629 (LUDVIGSEN EINAR [NO]); | [A]DE2529463 (POLEJOWSKI SIEGFRIED DIPL KFM); | [X]AT390661B (THERMOPANEL GES M B H [AT]); | [A]SE465229 (CARL ERIC JAEDERBERG, et al) |