07.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
22.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
04.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
22.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
15.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
28.05.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |
21.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
16.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
19.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
05.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
22.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
19.06.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
19.05.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.05.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.01.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.01.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
16.01.2009 |
Change - inventor |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
19.12.2008 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
25.09.2008 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
25.09.2008 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
19.06.2008 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.11.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2006 |
First examination report |
|
04.11.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.02.2006 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
23.02.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.02.2006 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
15.02.2006 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
24.01.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.06.2005 |
First examination report |
|
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
11.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.07.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] |
19.07.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] |
10.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.01.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|