EP1233785 - "BONZO" CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR ANTIBODIES AND LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 75 Sydney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRISKIN, Michael, J. 28 Harbell Street Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 02 /
MURPHY, Kristine E. Apt. 1, 14 Columbia Road Wakefield, MA 01880 / US | 03 /
WILBANKS, Alyson, M. 78 Porter Road 22 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 04 /
WU, Lijun 139 Oak Street Reading, MA 01867 / US | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence, The Old College, 53 High Street Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 00980738.9 | 22.11.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000US32206 | Priority number, date | US19990449437 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: US 449437 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0137872 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233785 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K45/00, G01N33/53, C07K14/52, C07K14/715, C07K16/24, C07K16/28, C07K16/46 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
C07K14/7158 (EP,US);
C07K16/24 (EP,US);
C07K16/2866 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | "BONZO" CHEMOKIN-REZEPTOR ANTIKÖRPER UND LIGANDE | [2002/35] | English: | "BONZO" CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR ANTIBODIES AND LIGANDS | [2002/35] | French: | ANTICORPS ET LIGANDS DU RECEPTEUR DE CHIMIOKINE "BONZO" | [2002/35] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 16.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | 13.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0834563 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]); | [X]US5824504 (ELSHOURBAGY NABIL A [US], et al); | [DA]WO9927078 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [A]WO9950670 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB]); | International search | [Y]WO9844098 (US HEALTH [US], et al); | [Y]WO9903888 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]) |