EP1263459 - ATTENUATION OF FIBROBLAST PROLIFERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibex Technologies, Inc. 5 Great Valley Parkway, Suite 300 Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2002/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENHOLM, Elizabeth, M. 2 Victoria Avenue Pointe Claire, Quebec H9S 4S3 / CA | 02 /
CAUCHON, Elizabeth 83 rue des Pins Ile Perrot, Quebec J7V 8L6 / CA | 03 /
SILVER, Paul, J. 154 Barton Drive Spring City, PA 19475-3418 / US | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Stephen Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Miles, John Stephen Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00980839.5 | 28.11.2000 | [2002/50] | WO2000US32399 | Priority number, date | US19990168518P | 02.12.1999 Original published format: US 168518 P | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0139795 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1263459 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/46, A61K38/51, A61P17/00, A61P43/00 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
A61K38/51 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERMINDERUNG DER FIBROBLASTEN PROLIFERATION | [2002/50] | English: | ATTENUATION OF FIBROBLAST PROLIFERATION | [2002/50] | French: | ATTENUATION DE LA PROLIFERATION DE FIBROBLASTES | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 03.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/09] | 09.01.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/09] | Appeal following examination | 23.06.2005 | Appeal received No. T1281/05 | 01.09.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.01.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP06077220.9 / EP1839671 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.10.2002 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | 02.10.2002 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.10.2002 | M02   Fee paid on   11.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9513091 (INT TECH MANAGEMENT ASS [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-15,17,18 * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 4 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 17 * * page 12, line 16 - page 14, line 8 * * page 17, line 26 - line 27 * * claims 1,16,17 *; | [X]US5695752 (ROSEN STEVEN D [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11 * column 6, line 6 - column 7, line 5 * * column 13, line 17 - column 14, line 4 * * column 15, line 12 - column 16, line 62 *; | [X]WO9846258 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US]) [X] 1-5,8-19 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9948478 (INSIGHT STRATEGY & MARKETING [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,8-19 * the whole document *; | [X] - DONATI L ET AL, "[Treatment of hypertrophic and keloid cicatrices with thiomucase]. Il trattamento delle cicatrici ipertrofiche e cheloidee mediante thiomucase.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, Database accession no. 76196588, URL: STN, XP002169931 [X] 1,6,8-11 * abstract * | [ ] - MINERVA CHIRURGICA, (1975 MAR 31) 30 (6) 326-33. | [A] - DENHOLM ELIZABEITH M, "Inhibition of fibroblast proliferation by chondroitinase AC(CAC) and chondroitinase B(CB).", FASEB JOURNAL, Annual Meeting of the Professional Research Scientists on Experimental Biology 98, Part II;San Francisco, California, USA; April 18-22, 1998, (19980320), vol. 12, no. 5, ISSN 0892-6638, page A948, XP002169930 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [T] - DENHOLM ELIZABETH M ET AL, "Inhibition of human dermal fibroblast proliferation by removal of dermatan sulfate.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 400, no. 2-3, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 145 - 153, XP001009717 [T] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-2999(00)00381-2 | Examination | WO0135977 |