EP1266411 - HIGH EFFICIENCY LIGHT EMITTERS WITH REDUCED POLARIZATION-INDUCED CHARGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Change - designated states | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states CREE, INC. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | ||
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states CREE RESEARCH, INC. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, North Carolina 27703 / US | ||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Cree Lighting Company 340 Storke Road Goleta, CA 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIBEAULT, Brian 1914 Cleveland Avenue Santa Barbara, CA 93103 / US | 02 /
IBBETSON, James 5230 Calle Cristobal Goleta, CA 93117 / US | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Golding, Louise Ann, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Golding, Louise Ann, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/40] | Samuels, Adrian James, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/28] | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2002/51] | Butcher, Ian James, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00980912.0 | 30.11.2000 | [2002/51] | WO2000US32712 | Priority number, date | US19990168495P | 02.12.1999 Original published format: US 168495 P | US20000728788 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: US 728788 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0141224 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1266411 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
H01L33/32 (EP,US);
H01L33/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2019/14] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHEFFIZIENTER LICHTEMITTER MIT REDUZIERTEN POLARISATION-INDUZIERTEN LADUNGEN | [2002/51] | English: | HIGH EFFICIENCY LIGHT EMITTERS WITH REDUCED POLARIZATION-INDUCED CHARGES | [2002/51] | French: | EMETTEURS DE LUMIERE A HAUTE EFFICACITE AVEC MOINDRES CHARGES INDUITES PAR POLARISATION | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 14.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/19] | 09.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/19] | Divisional application(s) | EP10196031.8 / EP2362433 | EP10196036.7 / EP2362434 | EP10196038.3 / EP2362435 | EP10196040.9 / EP2362436 | EP10196041.7 / EP2362437 | EP10196055.7 / EP2365536 | EP10196056.5 / EP2365537 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 08.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5432808 (HATANO AKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 44; figure 4; claims 1-20 *; | [X]US5909040 (OHBA YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, lines 16-23; figure 2 *; | [A]US5793054 (NIDO MASAAKI [JP]) [A] * claims 1,4,6 *; | [A]EP0905799 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] * claims 1,3 * | Examination | JPH11261108 |