EP1232335 - FREE-PISTON ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth AG Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [2003/02] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Mannesmann Rexroth GmbH Jahnstrasse 3 - 5 97816 Lohr/Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄFFER, Rudolf Rotkreuzstrasse 7 97828 Marktheidenfeld / DE | 02 /
DANTLGRABER, Jörg Dr. Hönlein-Strasse 14 97816 Lohr/Main / DE | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/34] | Winter, Brandl, &Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00981162.1 | 06.11.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000DE03886 | Priority number, date | DE19991056547 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19956547 | DE20001026728 | 30.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10026728 | [2002/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138706 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232335 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232335 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02B71/04, F01B11/00 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
F01B11/007 (EP);
F02B71/045 (EP);
F02B2075/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/06] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FREIKOLBENMOTOR | [2002/34] | English: | FREE-PISTON ENGINE | [2002/34] | French: | MOTEUR A PISTONS LIBRES | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 30.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3606591 (POTMA THEODORUS GERHARDUS) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * column A *; | [A]US4202251 (GEIRNAERT MARCEL [BE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * * column A * * column 3, line 44 - line 50 *; | [A]US4166410 (SCHLOSSER PAUL W [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * column A *; | [A]US5482445 (ACHTEN PETER A J [NL], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * figure 1 * * column A * * column 2, line 53 - line 60 * * column 3, line 14 - line 31 *; | [A]US4620836 (BRANDL GERHARD [AT]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 * * column A * * column 5, line 18 - line 30 *; | [A]DE2715896 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * * page 8, line 1 - line 20 * | by applicant | DE4024591 |