EP1224726 - SWITCHED POWER SUPPLY CONVERTER FOR BROAD RANGE OF INPUT VOLTAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2002/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONZALEZ GONZALEZ, Jorge Avda. La Vega, 8-3-2 B E-28100 Alcobendas / ES | 02 /
HUERTAS BLAZQUEZ, Antonio J. Camarena, 220 - 5 B E-28047 Madrid / ES | 03 /
FONTAN TARODO, Antonio Cerrolaza, 15 E-28224 Pozuelo de Alarcon / ES | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00981199.3 | 02.10.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000EP10104 | Priority number, date | ES19990002189 | 05.10.1999 Original published format: ES 9902189 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0126208 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224726 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1224726 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
H02M3/335 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTNETZTEIL FÜR BREITBANDIGE EINGANGSSPANNUNGEN | [2002/30] | English: | SWITCHED POWER SUPPLY CONVERTER FOR BROAD RANGE OF INPUT VOLTAGES | [2002/30] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR D'ALIMENTATION DOTE D'UN COMMUTATEUR ET CONCU POUR UNE LARGE GAMME DE TENSIONS D'ENTREE | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 31.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2003 | BE | 26.11.2003 | CH | 26.11.2003 | CY | 26.11.2003 | FI | 26.11.2003 | FR | 26.11.2003 | LI | 26.11.2003 | NL | 26.11.2003 | DK | 26.02.2004 | GR | 26.02.2004 | PT | 26.04.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
BE | 26.11.2003 | ||
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
FR | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
BE | 26.11.2003 | ||
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
FR | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
BE | 26.11.2003 | ||
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 26.11.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5006782 (PELLY BRIAN R [US]) [X] 1,5,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5394076 (HUYKMAN RICHARD B [US]) [X] 1,5* the whole document *; | [A]US5414342 (MAMMANO ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5570276 (CUK SLOBODAN [US], et al) [X] 1,5-10 * the whole document * |