EP1240008 - PLANT FOR PRODUCING TYRES OF DIFFERENT TYPES SIMULTANEOUSLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIRELLI PNEUMATICI S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states PIRELLI PNEUMATICI S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARETTA, Renato Viale Dei Tigli, 16 I-21013 Gallarate / IT | 02 /
MARIANI, Fiorenzo Via Toti, 2 I-20046 Biassono / IT | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Giannesi, Pier Giovanni, et al Pirelli & C. S.p.A. Direzione Proprietà Industriale Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Giannesi, Pier Giovanni, et al Pirelli & C. S.p.A. Direzione Proprietà Industriale Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2002/38] | Giannesi, Pier Giovanni, et al Pirelli S.p.A. Industrial Property Dept. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00981288.4 | 21.11.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000EP11599 | Priority number, date | EP19990123860 | 01.12.1999 Original published format: EP 99123860 | US19990168753P | 06.12.1999 Original published format: US 168753 P | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0139963 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240008 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1240008 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/00 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
B29D30/0016 (EP,US);
B29D30/00 (EP,US);
B29D30/005 (EP,US);
B29D2030/0055 (EP,US);
B29D2030/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN HERSTELLUNG VON VERSCHIEDENARTIGEN REIFEN | [2002/38] | English: | PLANT FOR PRODUCING TYRES OF DIFFERENT TYPES SIMULTANEOUSLY | [2002/38] | French: | INSTALLATION PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER SIMULTANEMENT DES PNEUMATIQUES DE DIFFERENTS TYPES | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 19.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.09.2005 | CH | 14.09.2005 | FI | 14.09.2005 | LI | 14.09.2005 | NL | 14.09.2005 | CY | 21.11.2005 | IE | 21.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | DK | 14.12.2005 | GR | 14.12.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2006/48] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
IE | 21.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0448407 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 13,14,22 * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 16 * * figures 1,3 *; | [XA]EP0776756 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 23 * page 3, line 30 - page 7, line 16 * * figure - *[A] 22; | [DX]EP0922561 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [DX] 13,14,22 * column 6, line 49 - column 12, line 37 * * figures 2,3 * |