EP1246862 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SULFONATED AROMATIC POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/41] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SULFONATED AROMATIC POLYMERS AND USE OF THE PROCESS PRODUCTS FOR PRODUCING MEMBRANES | ||
[2005/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pemeas GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2004/40] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Celanese Ventures GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Wei Nelly-Sachs-Strasse 46 89134 Blaustein / DE | 02 /
SOCZKA-GUTH, Thomas Rosenweg 6 89601 Schelklingen / DE | 03 /
FRANK, Georg Stäudach 164 72074 Tübingen / DE | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 00981353.6 | 08.12.2000 | [2002/41] | WO2000EP12427 | Priority number, date | DE1999159289 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19959289 | [2002/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0142336 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1246862 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1246862 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/48, C08G75/23, C08J5/22 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
C08J5/2256 (EP,US);
C08G75/23 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/00091 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/62 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B01D71/82 (EP,US);
C08G65/48 (EP,US);
H01M8/1027 (EP,US);
H01M8/103 (EP,US);
H01M8/1032 (EP,US);
C08J2371/12 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SULFONIERTEN AROMATISCHEN POLYMEREN | [2005/09] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SULFONATED AROMATIC POLYMERS | [2005/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE POLYMERES AROMATIQUES SULFONES | [2005/09] |
Former [2002/41] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SULFONIERTEN AROMATISCHEN POLYMEREN UND VERWENDUNG DER VERFAHRENSPRODUKTE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEMBRANEN | ||
Former [2002/41] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SULFONATED AROMATIC POLYMERS AND USE OF THE PROCESS PRODUCTS FOR PRODUCING MEMBRANES | ||
Former [2002/41] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE POLYMERES AROMATIQUES SULFONES ET UTILISATION DES PRODUITS DU PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION DE MEMBRANES | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 13.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 26.10.2005 | IE | 26.10.2005 | NL | 26.10.2005 | TR | 26.10.2005 | AT | 08.12.2005 | CY | 08.12.2005 | CH | 31.12.2005 | LI | 31.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | DK | 26.01.2006 | GR | 26.01.2006 | ES | 06.02.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | [2007/28] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
CY | 08.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DY]FR2040950 (RHONE POULENC SA); | [A]US3715323 (CRIVELLO J); | [DY]EP0341473 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [A]DE19526855 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]WO9705191 (HOECHST AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0768330 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A]DE19813613 (KERRES JOCHEN [DE], et al) |