EP1240447 - KICK-DOWN SWITCHING SPEED OPTIMIZATION FOR AN AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNEKEN, Markus Betznauer Strasse 12 88079 Kressbronn / DE | 02 /
JAUCH, Friedemann Ginsterweg 18 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | 03 /
HERBSTER, Kai-Uwe Tannenweg 57 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | 04 /
SCHULER, Franz-Josef Untermühleweg 14 88079 Kressbronn / DE | 05 /
MAUZ, Thomas Rosenstrasse 31 88085 Langenargen / DE | [2002/42] |
Former [2002/38] | 01 /
HENNEKEN, Markus Betznauer Strasse 12 88079 Kressbronn / DE | ||
02 /
JAUCH, Friedemann Ginsterweg 18 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | |||
03 /
HERBSTER, Kai-Uwe Tannenweg 57 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | |||
04 /
SCHULER, Franz-Josef Untermühleweg 14 88079 Kressbronn / DE | |||
05 /
MAUZ, Thomas Goethestrasse 47 88079 Kressbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 00981369.2 | 13.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000EP12637 | Priority number, date | DE1999161979 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19961979 | [2002/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146606 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240447 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1240447 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, // F16H59:20 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
F16H61/0213 (EP,KR,US);
B60W40/09 (EP,KR,US);
F16H59/20 (EP,KR,US);
F16H59/66 (EP,KR,US);
F16H2059/003 (EP,KR,US);
F16H2059/405 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/26] |
Former [2002/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | KICK-DOWN-SCHALTDREHZAHLOPTIMIERUNG FÜR EIN AUTOMATGETRIEBE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2002/38] | English: | KICK-DOWN SWITCHING SPEED OPTIMIZATION FOR AN AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2002/38] | French: | OPTIMISATION DU REGIME DE PASSAGE KICK-DOWN DE LA BOITE AUTOMATIQUE D'UN VEHICULE | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 30.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2709235 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1* Seite 3, Zusammenfassung *; | [A]DE3139838 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * Seite 6, letzter Absatz und Seite 7 *; | [A]US5157991 (SUMIMOTO TAKAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1,5 * column 5, line 1 - line 34 * * figures 2,3 * |