EP1232669 - ELECTROMECHANIC FILM AND ACOUSTIC ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Natural Colour Kari Kirjavainen OY Palomäentie 14 B 13 33230 Tampere / FI | [2002/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRJAVAINEN, Kari ILMARINKATU 12 A 6 FI-33500 TAMPERE / FI | [2008/25] |
Former [2002/34] | 01 /
KIRJAVAINEN, Kari Palomäentie 14 B 13 FIN-33230 Tampere / FI | Representative(s) | Huhtanen, Ossi Jaakko Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Huhtanen, Ossi Jaakko Kolster Oy AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00981408.8 | 24.11.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000FI01027 | Priority number, date | FI19990002514 | 25.11.1999 Original published format: FI 992514 | [2002/34] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0139544 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232669 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232669 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04R7/02 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
H04R19/013 (EP,US);
H04R7/02 (EP,US);
Y10S310/80 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/34] | H04R7/02, // H04R19:01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHER FILM UND AKUSTISCHES ELEMENT | [2002/34] | English: | ELECTROMECHANIC FILM AND ACOUSTIC ELEMENT | [2002/34] | French: | FILM ELECTROMECANIQUE ET ELEMENT ACOUSTIQUE | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2001 | Translation filed | 24.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 24.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 13.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 13.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2009 | BE | 28.01.2009 | CY | 28.01.2009 | DK | 28.01.2009 | FI | 28.01.2009 | IT | 28.01.2009 | NL | 28.01.2009 | TR | 28.01.2009 | SE | 28.04.2009 | GR | 29.04.2009 | ES | 09.05.2009 | PT | 29.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IT | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 28.01.2009 | |
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 28.01.2009 | |
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | ES | 09.05.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3947644 (UCHIKAWA SHOJI); | [A]US4186323 (CRAGG WILLIAM D [GB], et al); | [A]JPS5647199 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]US4400634 (MICHERON FRANCOIS [FR]); | [X]US4654546 (KIRJAVAINEN KARI [FI]); | [X]FI913741 (KIRJAVAINEN KARI JOHANNES [FI]); | [X]US5757090 (KIRJAVAINEN KARI [FI]) |