EP1154412 - OPTICAL DISK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONO, Kazuhiko 5-33-20, Makami-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1121 / JP | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00981677.8 | 13.12.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000JP08805 | Priority number, date | JP19990352935 | 13.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35293599 | [2001/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0143124 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1154412 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0045, G11B7/125, G11B7/09, G11B7/085 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
G11B7/126 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/24038 (KR);
G11B7/0045 (EP,US);
G11B7/08511 (EP,US);
G11B7/08547 (KR);
G11B7/0946 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2537 (KR);
G11B7/0037 (EP,US);
G11B7/004 (EP,US);
G11B7/0901 (EP,US);
G11B7/0908 (EP,US);
G11B7/0948 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | G11B7/0045 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES PLATTENGERAET | [2001/46] | English: | OPTICAL DISK DEVICE | [2001/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF A DISQUE OPTIQUE | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2001 | Translation filed | 03.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 24.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/29] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH10289450 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP) [X] 6,12 * abstract * [Y] 1-5,7-11; | [PXY]US6104019 (YOKOTA KAZUKI [JP]) [PX] 6,12 * the whole document * [PY] 1-5,7-11; | [Y]US4759006 (KOISHI KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS63271725 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 3,4,9,10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0407573 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 5,11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS61292227 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH03219440 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH1125468 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP) |