EP1272529 - MACROPOROUS CHITOSAN BEADS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Science and Technology 39-1 Hawolkog-dong, Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-130 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Korea Institute of Science and Technology 39-1 Hawolkog-dong, Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-130 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Seo, Young 205-501 Moonchonmaeul Juyeop-dong Ilsan-ku Koyang-si Kyunggi-do 411-370 / KR | 02 /
BAE, Eunhee 1-906 Chungwha Apt. Itaewon-dong 22-2, Yongsan Seoul 140-731 / KR | 03 /
KWON, Ick Chan 706-704 Chungsol Apt. Hagye-dong, Nowan-ku Seoul 139-230 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Kuiwon 108-301 Hansin Apt. 60 Chungryangli-dong Dongdaemoon-ku Seoul 130-011 / KR | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 00981902.0 | 30.11.2000 | [2003/02] | WO2000KR01388 | Priority number, date | KR19990060034 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: KR 9960034 | [2003/02] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146266 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272529 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/08, C12N11/16 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
C08J9/28 (EP,US);
C12N1/00 (KR);
C08B37/003 (EP,US);
C08L5/08 (EP,US);
C12N5/0075 (EP,US);
C08J2201/0484 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAKROPORÖSE CHITOSANKÜGELCHEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIESELBEN | [2003/02] | English: | MACROPOROUS CHITOSAN BEADS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2003/02] | French: | BILLES MACROPOREUSES DE CHITOSANE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CES DERNIERES | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2001 | Translation filed | 05.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 05.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 04.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/02] | 20.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9734645 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US], et al) [X] 2,3 * page 3, lines 18,19; example 1 *; | [XD] - MADIHALLY SUNDARARAJAN V ET AL, "Porous chitosan scaffolds for tissue engineering", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (199906), vol. 20, no. 12, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 1133 - 1142, XP001091399 [XD] 2 * page 1134, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 1141, column L, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(99)00011-3 | [X] - SHINONAGA MASA-AKI ET AL, "Continuous production of phospholipase D by Streptomyces lydicus D-121 immobilized with cross-linked chitosan beads", JOURNAL OF FERMENTATION AND BIOENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 81, no. 4, ISSN 0922-338X, pages 310 - 314, XP002362122 [X] 2,3,15 * page 310, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0922-338X(96)80582-4 | [X] - SHINONAGA MASA-AKI ET AL, "Immobilization of yeast cells with cross-linked chitosan beads", J FERMENT BIOENG; JOURNAL OF FERMENTATION AND BIOENGINEERING 1992, (1992), vol. 74, no. 2, pages 90 - 94, XP002362123 [X] 2,15 * page 90, column R; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0922-338X(92)80007-6 | [L] - FUJIBO HOLDINGS, INC., "Chitopearl", URL: http://www.fujibo.co.jp/us/kenkyujo/syohin/chitopearl/shhp.html, (20060111), XP002362138 | International search | [X]WO9734645 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US], et al); | [Y]KR20000020800 (KOREA ATOMIC ENERGY RES); | [X] - CHANG GUNG CHEN, J.P. & CHIU, S.H., "Preparation and characterization of urase immobilized onto porous beads for urea hydrolysis", BIOPROCESS ENG., (1999), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 323 - 330, XP002999767 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004490050683 |