EP1409843 - ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harcourt Engine PTY Limited Level 5, 77 The Esplanade Mooloolaba, QLD 4557 / AU | [2004/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARCOURT, Dougal Lamont 75 Brisbane Road Mooloolaba, QLD 4557 / AU | 02 /
SELBY, Robert James 8 Clarevale Street Christchurch / NZ | 03 /
WHITE, William Lewis 36a Vernon Terrace St Martin's, Christchurch / NZ | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2009/23] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2004/17] | Downey, William Gerrard, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw, 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00981932.7 | 07.12.2000 | [2004/17] | WO2000NZ00241 | Priority number, date | NZ19990501608 | 07.12.1999 Original published format: NZ 50160899 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0142624 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1409843 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01B13/04 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
F01B9/06 (EP,US);
F01B13/04 (KR);
F01B13/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTOR | [2004/17] | English: | ENGINE | [2004/17] | French: | MOTEUR | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/31] | 03.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 13.10.2003 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 18.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/33] | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/33] | Request for further processing for: | 13.10.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2004 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 09.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2008 | 31.12.2008 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US1285835 (SUNDERMAN FREDERICK R [US]); | [A]FR588204 ; | [Y]US1766385 (JACKSON JOHN S); | [Y]US1918174 (BERGGREN FRANS L); | [X]US1943937 (GUSTAF GUSTAFSON CARL); | [A]US1965548 (HART ALVIN L); | [X]FR46062E ; | [A]AU110318B (WILKERSON ROTARY ENGINE LTD, et al); | [X]US2417894 (WAYLAND GIENN J); | [X]FR54015E ; | [A]US3438358 (PORSCH FRED W, et al); | [A]WO8301091 (MONCADA JAIME) | by applicant | US2417894G | AU849627 | FR54015E | WO8301091 | EP0964136 |