|
20.05.2010 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Communication about possibility to obtain an European search report after lack of unity of the international application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
138 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
183 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
135 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
302 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
339 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2002 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.06.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.08.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.08.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
90 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
7 |