EP1242882 - A digital computer system and a method for responding to a request received over an external network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/39] | FEDERATED OPERATING SYSTEM FOR A SERVER | ||
[2004/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawai, Hachiro Nogawa 3020-10 Miyamae-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 216-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Kawai, Hachiro Nogawa 3020-10 Miyamae-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 216-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Thunder River Technologies, Inc. 23 Corporate Plaza Drive, Suite 250 Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANKINSON, Bradley, K., T. 4441-3 Via Sepulveda San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 02 /
SUGGS, Brian, D. 7362 Mannix Court San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00982533.2 | 08.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000US33323 | Priority number, date | US19990464945 | 16.12.1999 Original published format: US 464945 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0144938 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1242882 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1242882 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
G06F9/50 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Digitales Rechnersystem und Verfahren zur Beantwortung von über ein externes Netzwerk empfangenen Anfragen | [2004/43] | English: | A digital computer system and a method for responding to a request received over an external network | [2004/43] | French: | Système d'ordinateur digital et procédé pour répondre à une requête recue au moyen d'un réseau externe | [2004/43] |
Former [2002/39] | FÖDERIERTES BETRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN SERVER | ||
Former [2002/39] | FEDERATED OPERATING SYSTEM FOR A SERVER | ||
Former [2002/39] | SYSTEME D'EXPLOITATION FEDERE POUR SERVEUR | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 16.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.04.2005 | IT | 20.04.2005 | TR | 20.04.2005 | DK | 20.07.2005 | GR | 20.07.2005 | ES | 31.07.2005 | PT | 20.09.2005 | CY | 08.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
TR | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CY | 08.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
TR | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
TR | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 20.04.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5634053 (NOBLE WILLIAM B [US], et al) [A] 1-9,11-22,39-50,52-59,65-70,72,73,75-78,80-84,86-89,91-102,104-107,109-113,116-123,128-136 * abstract * * column 4, line 30 - line 41 ** column 5, line 10 - line 19 *; | [A]EP0817445 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-9,11-22,39-50,52-59,65-70,72,73,75-78,80-84,86-89,91-102,104-107,109-113,116-123,128-136 * abstract * * page 3, line 32 - line 35 * * page 4, line 38 - page 5, line 17 * * page 5, line 27 - line 34 * * page 5, line 53 - page 6, line 16 * * page 7, line 6 - line 11 * * page 8, line 17 - line 25 *; | [YA]EP0848341 (WEBTV NETWORKS INC [US]) [Y] 46-50,52-59,67,116,117 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 40 * * column 8, line 48 - column 12, line 25 * [A] 30; | [XA]WO9826559 (GTE INTERNETWORKING INC [US]) [X] 1,4-8,11,13-16,39,40,65,68,70,72,73,75-78,81-84,86-89,92-94,98-102,104-107,109-112,118-121,123,128-131,133,134,136 * abstract * * page 5, line 14 - line 17 * * page 10, line 21 - line 25 * * page 17, line 1 - page 20, line 20 * [A] 2,3,9,10,12,17-32,35-38,41-64,66,67,69,71,74,79,82,85,90,91,95-97,103,108,113-117,122,124-127,132,135; | [XAY]US5774660 (BRENDEL JUERGEN [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-22,39-45,65,66,68,70,72,73,75-78,80-84,86-89,91-96,98-102,104-107,109-113,118-121,123,128-134,136 * abstract * * column 6, line 9 - line 58 * * column 7, line 14 - line 29 * * column 9, line 17 - column 10, line 2 * * column 10, line 38 - line 53 * * column 11, line 50 - column 12, line 63 * * column 13, line 33 - line 597 * * column 17, line 27 - line 64 * [A] 10,23-27,29-32,35-38,51,60-64,71,74,79,82,85,90,103,108,114,124-127 [Y] 46-50,52-59,67,69,97,116,117,122,135; | [YA]WO9913619 (SICS SWEDISH INST OF COMPUTER [SE], et al) [Y] 69,122,135 * page 2, line 28 - page 8, line 34 * * abstract * [A] 51; | [XAY] - GOLDSZMIDT G. S., "LOAD MANAGEMENT FOR SCALING UP INTERNET SERVICES", IEEE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980215), vol. CONF. 10, ISBN 0-7803-4352-2, pages 828 - 835, XP000793430 [X] 1,4-8,11,13-16,39,40,65,68,70,72,73,75-78,81-84,86-89,92-94,98-102,104-107,109-112,118-121,123,128-131,133,134,136 * abstract * * page 831, line 1 - page 833, line L * [A] 2,3,9,10,12,17-32,35-38,41-64,66,67,69,71,74,79,82,85,90,91,95,96,103,108,113-117,122,124-127,132,135 [Y] 97 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS.1998.655224 | [A] - HUNT G. D. H., GOLDSZMIDT G. S., KING R. P., MUKHERJEE R., "NETWORK DISPATCHER: A CONNECTION ROUTER FOR SCALABLE INTERNET SERVICES", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980401), vol. 30, no. 1-7, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 347 - 357, XP004121412 [A] 1-9,11-22,39-50,52-59,65-70,72,73,75-78,80-84,86-89,91-102,104-107,109-113,116-123,128-136 * abstract * * page 348, column L, line 11 - line 31 * * page 348, column R, line 1 - page 353, column R, line 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(98)00088-9 |